HI SB787 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB787
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of GO bonds to finance plans, design, construction, and equipment for new music facilities at President Roosevelt high school.
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects For President Theodore Roosevelt High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB787 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
HB1492 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1492 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Capital Improvement Projects
CIP
GO Bonds
Music Facilities
President Roosevelt High School
Capital Improvement Projects
CIP
GO Bonds
Music Facilities
President Roosevelt High School
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=787&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB787_.HTM |