HI SB808 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to amend its administrative rules to repeal any provisions requiring the furnishing of evidence of registration as a condition precedent to receiving a certificate of inspection.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Safety Inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB808 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB808 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.