HI SB816 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates Kahoolawe island reserve commission oversight of the department of land and natural resources and other departments and agencies of the State with regard to the control and management of the island reserve. Provides that the commission and other state agencies shall be subject to the oversight of the department with regard to the control and management of the island reserve. Apportions ten per cent of the conveyance tax to the Kahoolawe rehabilitation trust fund. (SD1)
Title
Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Kahoolawe Conveyance Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |