HI SB816 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB816
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a state lottery to begin by 1/1/2023. Creates the state lottery commission, state lottery account, and lottery administration account. Requires certain amounts of lottery revenues to be deposited into the administrative account, general fund, and special funds for university facilities and operations and public school operations. (SD1)
Title
Relating To A State Lottery.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB816 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.