HI SB822 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 021, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 021, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the implementation schedule and calculation method for minimum number of days and student hours required for Department of Education schools in each school year. Applies the requirement for a 180 day, 1,080 hour school year to all school years beginning with the 2016-2017 school year. (SB822 HD2)
Title
Department of Education; Student Hours
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Act 021, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Act 021, 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 639). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-17-15. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-17-15. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 544). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, LoPresti; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 213) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 825) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Ruderman. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EDU/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).