HI SB824 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons arrested for a felony offense involving a violent crime to provide DNA samples. Provides for the expungement and destruction of DNA records under certain circumstances. Provides funds directly to the counties to fund expenses necessary for DNA collection and expungement.
Title
Forensic Identification; DNA; Violent Crime; Expungement; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=824&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB824_.HTM |