HI SB840 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To strengthen our laws related to public administration by creating a new offense that prohibits the obstruction of criminal investigations, and by upgrading certain public administration offenses to reflect the seriousness of the offenses.
Title
Public Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1022 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=840&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB840_.htm |