HI SB844 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires manual recounts of election votes when the margin of victory is less than two hundred fifty votes or less than one per cent of the votes cast, whichever is less.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB370 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB844 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB844 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=844&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB844_.HTM |