HI SB844 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special number plates to commemorate Malama Puuloa. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Special Number Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Aiu Co-Chairs; Martinez, Alcos. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Aquino, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2023-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 607). |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1922), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1419) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-15 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-10 | House | Re-referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB844 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).