HI SB852 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB852
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes reduced taxpayer penalties for nonpayments and underpayments that are due to reasonable cause. Allows a taxpayer to post a bond to avoid penalties and interest. Assesses interest on a deficiency in state income tax payment caused by a change in the taxable income reported on the taxpayer's federal tax return.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB852 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=852&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB852_.HTM |