HI SB858 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a five-year evidence-based physical-activity and nutritional-education pilot program within the A+ Program in Hawaii's public elementary schools. Makes appropriations.
Title
Afterschool Programs; Elementary-School Students; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:30PM in conference room CR229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB731 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=858&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB858_.HTM |