HI SB867 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB867
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the low-income housing tax credit provisions made by Act 129, Session Laws of Hawaii 2016, under the low-income housing tax credit program, for six years to 12/31/2027. Effective 12/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-11-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB867 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Low-income Housing Tax Credit Program
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Low-income Housing Tax Credit Program