HI SB870 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes electric generation and delivery initiatives necessary for and contributing to the transition of Hawaii's energy sector to 70 percent non-petroleum energy sources by 2030.
Title
Hawaii Clean Energy Initiative; Electric Generation and Delivery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE-CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE-CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1052 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=870&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB870_.htm |