HI SB872 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, JDL.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET, JDL.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that electronic copies shall be construed in the same manner as an original document for purposes of chapter 1, HRS. Requires that electronic copies are acceptable for all purposes as intended by the particular statute that references an original document or like terms, unless otherwise provided by that statute.
Title
Documents; Electronic Copies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=872&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB872_.HTM |