HI SB872 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB872
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the chairperson of the Hawaiian Homes Commission or the chairperson's designee to serve as an ex officio, voting member on the Commission on Water Resource Management.
Title
Relating To The Commission On Water Resource Management.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB872 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=872&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB872_.HTM |