HI SB877 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 096, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 096, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to provide written notice of hearing to all parties by first class mail at least fifteen days before the hearing and clarifies the Board's powers for conducting appeals under Hawaii laws relating to occupational safety and health. (CD1)
Title
Occupational Safety and Health; Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 096, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 096, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1196). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 154) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 154). |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Hashem Co-Chairs; Ing. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 555). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |