HI SB877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB877
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to establish and fund two advanced life support ambulances based in Puna and Makalei on the island of Hawaii, including acquisition of vehicles, equipment, and personnel costs.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB877 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=877&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB877_.HTM |