HI SB88 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB88
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a state lottery to begin by 1/1/2020. Creates the state lottery commission, state lottery account, and lottery administration account. Requires certain amounts of lottery revenues to be deposited into the administrative account, general fund, and special funds for public school facilities and operations, university facilities and operations, and the city and county of Honolulu area rapid transit.
Title
Relating To A State Lottery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB88 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-Referred to GVO/HRE, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=88&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB88_.HTM |