HI SB890 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant to the Pacific-Asia institute for resilience and sustainability to continue in its collaborative research efforts in exploring methods to improve energy efficiency and grid operations in all of Hawaii.
Title
Energy Efficiency; Grid Operations; Pacific-Asia Institute for Resilience and Sustainability; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 44) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Galuteria. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=890&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB890_.HTM |