HI SB890 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB890
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 127, Session Laws of Hawaii 2016, to clarify the duties of the Special Action Team on Affordable Rental Housing and add additional members to the Special Action Team for the purpose of addressing issues related to extremely low-income household needs. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Rental Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB890 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=890&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB890_.HTM |