HI SB894 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB894
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes e-liquid and electronic smoking devices within the definition of "tobacco products", as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law. Establishes a tax of twenty per cent for the wholesale price for electronic smoking devices and 10 cents for each milliliter of e-liquid. Allocates a portion of funds collected on excise taxes on electronic smoking devices and eliquids to the trauma system special fund, community health centers special fund, and emergency medical services special fund.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB630 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB894 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
SB894 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The committee(s) on HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=894&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB894_.HTM |