HI SB904 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to locate suitable properties for a housing first program to implement affordable rental housing projects, including an initial housing first single-resident occupancy affordable rental housing model project site in an urban core. Requires DHS to report to the legislature and the governor. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Homelessness; Housing First
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2). | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Reported from HSG/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Thielen. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Thielen. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WLO on Wednesday, 03-16-11 9:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-11 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |