HI SB904 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB904
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide program modeled after the Hawaii's Opportunity Probation with Enforcement (HOPE) program that was implemented in the City and County of Honolulu from 2004 through 2019. Requires the Judiciary to administer the program.
Title
Relating To Probation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB904 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
HB584 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB584 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=904&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB904_.HTM |