HI SB919 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Act 026, on 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Act 026, on 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal biennium 2017-2019 for Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund costs for public employees in collective bargaining units (7), (1), and (10) and their excluded counterparts. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Act 026, on 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Act 026, 05/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 177) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 177). |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Luke, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-28 | House | Received from Governor re: Tentative Agreement (Gov. Msg. No. 14). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:30PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 1:35PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Holt, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 530). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1720), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-14-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1053 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5