HI SB927 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB927
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that up to $50,000 per year in income earned and proceeds derived from stock options or stock by an employee from a qualified high technology business, as defined therein, or an investor who qualifies for a high technology business investment tax credit, shall be excluded from taxation, provided that amounts in excess of $50,000 in the taxable year shall be taxed at the applicable income tax rate. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB316 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB927 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB927 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.