HI SB929 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates and implements a silver alert program to alert the public of any missing senior citizen with an impaired mental condition, to be operated concurrently with the Maile Amber Alert program.
Title
Silver Alert System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=929&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB929_.HTM |