HI SB929 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB929
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for timely review by the public utilities commission in its decision-making process regarding proposed renewable energy projects. Requires timely completion of the interconnection process by electric public utilities. Allows electric public utilities and developers to agree to extend the timely completion of the interconnection process. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 349) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPN/WAM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB929 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
HB560 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
HB560 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).