HI SB929 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB929
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation Highways Division to implement recommendations made by the Office of the Auditor regarding compliance with federal funding laws and regulations and information technology authentication. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-07-23 3:00PM; CR 224. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB929 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.