HI SB934 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish exempt positions entitled total maximum daily load coordinator. (SD1)
Title
Water Pollution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hooser, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.