HI SB953 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB953
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 1/1/2022, prohibits the issuance of building permits for new building construction unless the applicant provides sufficient proof that the building will be able to withstand category four hurricanes. Beginning 1/1/2022, requires building permits to be obtained for work performed for state government agencies on all new public buildings, and requires new public buildings to be designed to withstand category five hurricanes.
Title
Relating To Public Improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB425 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB953 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM/GVO, JDC.
SB953 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM/GVO, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=953&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB953_.HTM |