HI SB959 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB959
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii Pamantasan Council for three full-time equivalent academic and support services specialist positions.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |