HI SB964 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reimbursement to federally qualified health centers and rural health clinics for services covered by all MedQuest programs. Appropriates funds for direct medical care to the uninsured. (SD1)
Title
Public Health; QUEST; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |