HI SB964 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB964
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that emergency shelters may provide partitioned space for homeless persons or families based upon Department of Human Services (DHS) guidelines. Extends by one year, the emergency shelter compliance requirements per Act 234, Session Laws of Hawaii (SLH) 2016, for contracts between DHS and emergency or transitional shelter provider agencies. Extends the effective date of Act 234, SLH 2016. (SB964 HD1)
Title
Relating To Homeless Shelters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1104) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 310) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1098 (Same As)
SB964 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
SB964 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).