HI SB970 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a portion of conveyance tax revenues dedicated to the rental housing trust fund to be monetized to increase the amount of funding for the rental housing trust fund. Authorizes the issuance of revenue bonds to finance the rental housing trust fund.
Title
Rental Housing Trust Fund; Conveyance Tax; Revenue Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=970&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB970_.HTM |