HI SB971 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Emergency Medical Services Special Fund and deposits moneys from the fund's revenue sources into the general fund, and appropriates an equivalent amount of general funds for the Department of Health. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1105 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB971 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB971 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27