HI SB971 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a scholarship program to be directed and administered by the Department of Education to make awards to students pursuing teaching degrees at state accredited institutions of higher education who successfully complete one course in computer science. (SB971 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1636) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).