HI SB98 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from tampering with a public highway or a facility of public transportation that would result in a risk of death or serious bodily injury to anyone. Defines facility of public transportation. Classifies endangering public transportation as a class C felony.
Title
Endangering Public Transportation; Public Highway
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, English, Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA deferred the measure until 01-29-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRA, JDL. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=98&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB98_.HTM |