HI SB984 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to LAB/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to LAB/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an interagency working group consisting of the senate education committee chairperson, house of representatives education committee chairperson, superintendent of education, and comptroller, or their designees, and any other persons the superintendent of education or comptroller deem necessary. Tasks the interagency working group with discussing various issues relating to Act 51, Session Laws of Hawaii 2004. Requires the actual transfer of personnel and functions of the department of accounting and general services related to neighbor island public schools to the department of education to be completed by 7/1/2017. (SD2)
Title
Department of Education; Department of Accounting and General Services; Interagency Working Group; Appropriations; Transfer ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 250) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Nishihara. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1230 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Re-Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM.