HI SB987 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Act 034, 5/5/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Act 034, 5/5/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that under the Hawaii Post-Secondary Education Authorization Program, institutions may request an administrative hearing pursuant to chapter 91, HRS, for proceedings concerning denials, suspensions, or terminations. (SB987 HD1)
Title
Post-Secondary Education; Authorization; Administrative Hearing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Act 034, 5/5/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134). |
2015-05-07 | House | Act 034, on 5/5/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 639). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-17-15. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-17-15. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-10-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 361). |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-15. |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-30-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1070) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Matsumoto, Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HED, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HEA, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB848 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to HEA, JDL.