HI SB991 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 229, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 229, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Caps annual utility rate increases without PUC approval for counties with a population of less than 500,000. Provides telecommunications service providers with flexibility from certain regulatory oversight requirements including issuance of securities and other evidences of indebtedness, and sales or disposition of property or equipment, if the utility is providing fully competitive retail services and specific conditions are met. Specifies other requirements related to flexibility for telecommunications service providers. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Telecommunications.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 229, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 229, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 852). |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 763). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2189), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1587), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-27-19 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-26-19 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB272 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
Subjects
Affiliate Transactions
Basic Exchange Service
Financing
Issuance of Stock
Pricing Flexibility
Sale, Lease, Encumbrance of Assets
Telecommunications
Basic Exchange Service
Financing
Issuance of Stock
Pricing Flexibility
Sale, Lease, Encumbrance of Assets
Telecommunications