HI SCR100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ward excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ward excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Strive To Achieve Or Maintain Gender Equity In The Nominations And Appointments Of Members To State Boards And Commissions.
Title
Gender Equity; Boards; Commissions
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ward excused (1). |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1743), recommending referral to JUD. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-18-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 52 |
2013-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 439). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=100&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR100_.HTM |