HI SCR102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The People Of Korea To Engage In Dialogue Regarding The Peaceful Reunification Of The Korean Peninsula.
Title
United Nations; Human Rights; North Korea
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-04-13 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-15-15 10:15AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 48 |
2015-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 393) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-15. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-30-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to TSI. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |