HI SCR104 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And United States Military To Coordinate And Address The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within Waipahu And The Surrounding Communities Of Ewa, Pearl City, And Aiea On Oahu.
Title
Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And United States Military To Coordinate And Address The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within Waipahu And The Surrounding Communities Of Ewa, Pearl City, And Aiea On Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 754). |
2024-04-15 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe excused (6). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1913-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 404) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3528) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR86 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24