HI SCR113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Supreme Court Standing Committee On The Rules Of Evidence To Study And Report On The Implementation Of The Hawaii Uniform Collaborative Law Act.
Title
Hawaii Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 627) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |