HI SCR119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health Developmental Disabilities Division To Convene A Task Force To Determine The Feasibility Of Changing Its Eligibility Criteria For The Home And Community-based Services Medicaid Waiver For Individuals Having Intellectual Or Developmental Disabilities, Or Mental Illnesses.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health Developmental Disabilities Division To Convene A Task Force To Determine The Feasibility Of Changing Its Eligibility Criteria For The Home And Community-based Services Medicaid Waiver For Individuals Having Intellectual Or Developmental Disabilities, Or Mental Illnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Misalucha. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR119 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR93 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR93 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.