HI SCR122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct An Audit To Determine The Existence Of Potential Patterns Of Abuse In The Use Of State And Federal Leave Benefits By Adult Corrections Officers Of The Department Of Public Safety.
Title
Audit of Potential Absenteeism Abuse by State Correctional Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, L. Thielen. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=122&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR122_.HTM |