HI SCR128 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Create A Task Force To Develop A Plan To Increase The Number Of Students In Science, Technology, Engineering, And Mathematics Majors Relevant To Industry Demands In Hawaii.
Title
STEM; University of Hawaii; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 476) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3225) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3083), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |