HI SCR131 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Reduction Of Children's Exposure To Adverse Childhood Experiences By Investing In Preventive Health Care And Mental Health Wellness Interventions, Including Native Hawaiian Cultural Practices.
Title
Urging The Reduction Of Children's Exposure To Adverse Childhood Experiences By Investing In Preventive Health Care And Mental Health Wellness Interventions, Including Native Hawaiian Cultural Practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR131 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 49
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=131&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR131_.HTM |