HI SCR134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 58
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Sale Of Certain Land Owned By The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To The City And County Of Honolulu.
Title
Approving The Sale Of Certain Land Owned By The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs To The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 58 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 530). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3481) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3313), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR134 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HCR116 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR116 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=134&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR134_.HTM |