HI SCR135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Full Voting Rights For Residents Of The District Of Columbia.
Title
United States Congress; Full Voting Rights for Residents of the District of Columbia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 743). |
2013-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-25 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1763), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Tsuji, McDermott. |
2013-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 661). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=135&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR135_.HTM |